skip to content

Garach, Mehul Anil

CPSO#: 110046

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: 5196612019 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Anjana Naik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Naik ( CPSO# 88175 )
Dr. M. Garach ( CPSO# 110046)

Business Address:
110 Water Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 5T3
Phone Number: (519) 491-1119

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2021 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEHUL ANIL GARACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARACH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021