skip to content

Fleiman, Meri Kinneret

CPSO#: 92801

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: Friedman, Meri Kinneret (used until: 14 Aug 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 43000
Fax: 4162421025 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. K. Fleiman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fleiman ( CPSO# 92801 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
5th Floor East
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Feb 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MERI KINNERET FLEIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLEIMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 08 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History