skip to content

El-Khodary, Mohamed Ahmed Ibrahim

CPSO#: 99328

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Sep 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34072 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kwok-Liu ( CPSO# 29730 )
Dr. R. Rebello ( CPSO# 71123 )
Dr. M. Voss ( CPSO# 74024 )
Dr. G. So ( CPSO# 76100 )
Dr. J. O'Neill ( CPSO# 78167 )
Dr. C. Boylan ( CPSO# 78775 )
Dr. N. Muhn ( CPSO# 79555 )
Dr. J. Coret-Simon ( CPSO# 79858 )
Dr. A. Coret ( CPSO# 79859 )
Dr. F. Al-Douri ( CPSO# 81593 )
Dr. S. Harish ( CPSO# 83316 )
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 84853 )
Dr. V. Leung ( CPSO# 93077 )
Dr. A. Alabousi ( CPSO# 95414 )
Dr. E. Stubbs ( CPSO# 96256 )
Dr. M. El-Khodary ( CPSO# 99328 )
Dr. O. Mironov ( CPSO# 107610)

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-6009

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
G2 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
104- 1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Business Address:
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 207
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone Number: (905) 389-0300


Corporation Name: Mohamed El-Khodary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. El-Khodary ( CPSO# 99328 )

Business Address:
707 Canyon Street
Mississauga ON  L5H 4M2
Phone Number: (613) 447-9977

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 0E3
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMED AHMED IBRAHIM EL-KHODARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-KHODARY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015