skip to content

Christakis, Monique Sabina

CPSO#: 62099

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: Starok, Monique Sabina (used until: 31 Oct 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
Sunnybrook Health Science Center
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5730 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Monique Christakis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
A Wing Ground Floor
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5730


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MONIQUE SABINA CHRISTAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTAKIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1991