skip to content

Chowdhury, Mohammad Fahad

CPSO#: 100911

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Infectious Diseases
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON. K1Y 4E9
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 14155 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 210
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Canada
Phone: 613-680-9092
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chowdhury Karim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Karim ( CPSO# 95238 )
Dr. M. Chowdhury ( CPSO# 100911)

Business Address:
1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Infectious Diseases
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: 613-798-5555

Business Address:
210-770 Broadview Ave
West Ottawa Specialty Centre
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: 613-680-9092

Business Address:
3500 Fallowfield Road
Nepean ON  K2J 4A7
Phone Number: (613) 843-1718

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD FAHAD CHOWDHURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOWDHURY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2018