skip to content

Chacko, Mary

CPSO#: 68076

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1996

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:Indore University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Medical Centre
2100 Ellesmere Road
Suite 102
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Phone: (416) 438-8517
Fax: (416) 438-8518 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chacko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chacko ( CPSO# 68076 )
Dr. P. Thomas ( CPSO# 112104)

Business Address:
2100 Medical Centre
102 - 2100 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 438-8517

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY CHACKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHACKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996