skip to content

Brine, Meggan Ashleigh

CPSO#: 93780

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Meggan Brine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brine ( CPSO# 93780 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEGGAN ASHLEIGH BRINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 10 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 11 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2013
Dear members, your member portal will be unavailable for maintenance and updates from August 5th 5pm to August 9th 9am. We apologize for the inconvenience and appreciate your patience.