Bhargava, Mukesh (CPSO#: 97340)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Mar 2012

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Gandhi Medical College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
IMCare
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 377-7793
Fax: (905) 373-6969
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Heart Care
Medical Sciences Building
372 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J9
Canada
Phone: (905) 377-7793
Fax: (905) 373-6969
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhargava Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sharma ( CPSO# 97380 )
Dr. M. Bhargava ( CPSO# 97340 )

Business Address:
Heart Care Cardiac
Wellness Centre
Medical Sciences Building
372 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 268-8882

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (888) 268-8882

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Mar 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jan 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Mukesh  Bhargava may practise medicine independently in internal medicine,
            only.