skip to content

Bengough, Michael Norman

CPSO#: 88322

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Oct 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael N. Bengough Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bengough ( CPSO# 88322 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5038

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:28 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL NORMAN BENGOUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENGOUGH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 May 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 May 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Dear members, your member portal will be unavailable for maintenance and updates from August 5th 5pm to August 9th 9am. We apologize for the inconvenience and appreciate your patience.