First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 May 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 May 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2015 |