skip to content

Lyte, Kristina Lee

CPSO#: 93667

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Building P-210
641 Cambrai Road
Borden ON  L0M 1C0
Phone: (705) 424-1200 Ext. 7122
Fax: (705) 423-7242 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Maple Provider - House Calls
355 Adelaide St. W, Unit 100
Toronto ON  M5V 1S2
Canada
Phone: 647-497-7453
Fax: 888-745-0435
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Teladoc Health Provider
145 King Street West, Suite 700
Toronto ON  M5H1J8
Canada
Phone: 416-864-3776
Fax: 866-804-6524
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kristina Lyte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 10 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Aug 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KRISTINA LEE LYTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2012