skip to content

Lysecki, David Lawrence

CPSO#: 90667

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pediatrics, HSC 3W10A
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905 521 2100 Ext. 72759
Fax: 905 521 2601 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. L. Lysecki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lysecki ( CPSO# 90667 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Pediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Suite 3W10A
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID LAWRENCE LYSECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYSECKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2015