Lyons, Owen Daniel (CPSO#: 99569)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Feb 2016

Expiry Date:  28 Feb 2023

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Feb 2016

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Division of Respirology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6137
Fax: 416 323 6132
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

UHN-Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth street
Toronto ON  M5G2C4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 29 Feb 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Oct 2012 to 21 Jan 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 01 Nov 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Nov 2015 to 29 Feb 2016
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2023

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Owen Daniel Lyons may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in   a   setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Division  of
                        Respirology,  Department  of  Medicine,  University  of Toronto, in
                        which  Dr.  Lyons  holds  an  academic  appointment at the rank  of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr. Lyons no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr.  Lyons' clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Lyons' certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of  the  practice  assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on February 29, 2016.  In accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate  will,  if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on February 28, 2023.