Lynch, Meredith Deloris (CPSO#: 99942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Canada
Phone: 905-828-2066
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street E
Grimsby ON  L3M1P3
Canada
Phone: 9059452253
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEREDITH DELORIS LYNCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYNCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2013 to 05 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017