skip to content

Lynch, Jessica Clare Raso

CPSO#: 101013

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Holland Bloorview Kids
Rehabilitation Hospital
150 Kilgour Rd
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone: (416) 425-6220 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA CLARE RASO LYNCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYNCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 01 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2019