skip to content

Lymberiou, Timothy David

CPSO#: 97197

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:14 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 16 Jan 2012 to 05 Feb 2012
EL - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Jun 2014
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2014