skip to content

Lychacz, Bohdan Iwan

CPSO#: 32073

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6010
Fax: (416) 530-6060 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bohdan Lychacz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lychacz ( CPSO# 32073 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6001


Corporation Name: T.M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 5 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BOHDAN IWAN LYCHACZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYCHACZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1980