skip to content

Luyet, Cedric

CPSO#: 93847

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Bern, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 24 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011