skip to content

Lussier, Paul Albert

CPSO#: 99416

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Sep 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Midwestern University (AZCOM), 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huron Perth Health Care Alliance
Stratford General Hospital Site
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210 Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2014 Active
                   Dr.  Paul  Albert Lussier may practise medicine independently in internal
                  medicine, only.