skip to content

Lusher, Brandon Ezra

CPSO#: 93362

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Upstate Medical Center State Univ of N Y, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Weeneebayko General Hospital
PO Box 34
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone: (705) 658-4544 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brandon Lusher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lusher ( CPSO# 93362 )

Business Address:
Weeneebayko General Hospital
19 Hospital Drive
P.O. Box 34
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Attawapiskat Site Attawapiskat
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Fort Albany Site Fort Albany
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site Moosonee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRANDON EZRA LUSHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUSHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012