skip to content

Lummack, Keith Fredrick

CPSO#: 23531

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Keith Lummack Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 203-132 Parkdale Ave S Hamilton ON L8K 3P3 Tel: (905) 545-7711 4B-754 Queenston Rd Hamilton ON L8G 1A4 Tel: (289) 389-9695 Fax: (289) 398-5359
Instructions: Patients may contact the addresses above.
Date Received: 01 Apr 2019


Address: Suite 203 132 Parkdale Avenue South Hamilton ON L8K 3P3 Tel: (905) 545-7711
Date Received: 10 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015