skip to content

Luks, Vanessa Penelope Jane

CPSO#: 86204

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Box 211 Room 6351
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79585
Fax: (613) 737-8537 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

984 Oliver Road, Thunder Bay, ON
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6001
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

1-820 Red River Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 1K2
Canada
Phone: 613-683-4415
Fax: 613-683-4420
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vanessa Luks Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Luks ( CPSO# 86204 )

Business Address:
Unit 1
820 Red River Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5K4
Phone Number: (807) 683-4415

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6001

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
PO Box 211
6351 - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:17 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VANESSA PENELOPE JANE LUKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
CF - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012