skip to content

Lukowski, Anna Leokadia

CPSO#: 92978

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 12 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:McGill University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Dept of Medical Oncology/Hematology
610 University Avenue
5-700
Toronto ON  M5G 2C1
Phone: (416) 946-2000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Ave
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2600 Ext. 2579
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lukowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lukowski ( CPSO# 92978 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology and Hematology
610 University Avenue
Suite DM0H
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Brichmount Avenue
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital General Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:12 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Feb 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012 Active
 

                  Dr.  Anna  Leokadia  Lukowski  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
                  Internal Medicine, only.