skip to content

Lukovic, Jelena

CPSO#: 98312

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Radiation Medicine Program
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: 416-946-4483
Fax: 416-946-6561 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jelena Lukovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 6 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JELENA LUKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017