skip to content

Lukings, Jorin John

CPSO#: 95055

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Family Health Centre
1338 Fourth Ave
Suite S100
St Catharines ON  L2S0G1
Phone: (905) 984-3335
Fax: (905) 984-6008 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jorin Lukings Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lukings ( CPSO# 95055 )

Business Address:
Niagara Family Health Centre
1338 Fourth Avenue
Suite S100
St Catharines ON  L2S 0G1
Phone Number: (905) 984-3335

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JORIN JOHN LUKINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKINGS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013