skip to content

Luka, Marian Refaat Shaker

CPSO#: 94477

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105 Sutherland Dr
Kingston ON  K7K 5V6
Phone: (613)766-0318
Fax: (613)766-0339 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marian Luka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Luka ( CPSO# 94477 )

Business Address:
1027 Woodhaven Dr
Kingston ON  K7P 0H7
Phone Number: 6135307626

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIAN REFAAT SHAKER LUKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 19 Oct 2010 to 10 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 11 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 19 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2013