skip to content

Luk, Fong Ford

CPSO#: 25440

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McGill University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Inc 111 Regis Cres S Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 31 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019