skip to content

Luk, Cynthia Theresa

CPSO#: 89790

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Diabetes & Endocrinology
St. Michael's Health Centre
61 Queen St. East, 7th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: 416-867-7424
Fax: 416-867-3654 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA THERESA LUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 25 Aug 2008 to 19 Sep 2008
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2011