skip to content

Lujic, Jelka-Maria Irma

CPSO#: 99417

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Oct 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, French, German

Education:Universite De Besancon, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4169 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jelka Lujic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lujic ( CPSO# 99417 )

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Room B310
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



France

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Oct 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2019
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Feb 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014 Active
                   Dr.  Jelka-Maria  Irma  Lujic  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
                  anaesthesia, only.