skip to content

Garcia Pan, Luis Cesar

CPSO#: 55290

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 28 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
28 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 18 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education: University of the Republic, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Cesar Garcia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 12 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Sep 2021

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Garcia Pan’s professional misconduct have been referred to what is now the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that during a medical appointment in December, 2010, Dr. Garcia Pan engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and/or in disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional conduct by, among other things, making inappropriate and/or sexual remarks to a patient, engaging in inappropriate and/or sexual touching of a patient and engaging in inappropriate and/or sexual behaviour towards a patient.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): August 16 - 20, 2021