skip to content

Ludwin, Samuel Katzenellenbogen

CPSO#: 28784

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 04 Nov 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Samuel K. Ludwin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 10 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:25 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Neuropathology Effective:30 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Nov 2013