skip to content

Ludwig, Nathan Scott

CPSO#: 95063

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Room C2-168
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: NS Ludwig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ludwig ( CPSO# 95063 )

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4

Business Address:
230 Victoria Street
London ON  N6A 2C2

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Room B2424
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8525

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Room C3-108
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6S 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Rd E
Department of Anesthesia
Room C2-167
London ON  N6A 5W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATHAN SCOTT LUDWIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUDWIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2017