skip to content

Ludwig, John James

CPSO#: 25608

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Jun 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John James Ludwig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South Website: www.rsrs.com Tel: (416) 398-0638 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 28 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Oct 1989
Summary:

In October 1989, Dr. Ludwig pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 27(3); in that he contravened while engaged in the practice of medicine a federal, provincial or municipal law, regulation or rule or a by-law of a hospital designed to protect the public health, contrary to s. 27(20); in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32). The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Ludwig guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Ludwig be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee also ruled that the Doctor's licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months, but that this suspension would itself be suspended if Dr. Ludwig undertook to attend the McMaster Physician Review Program, with special emphasis on record-keeping and pharmacology and any remedial programs recommended by the university, to the satisfaction of the Registrar, within one year of this Order becoming final. It was also stipulated that Dr. Ludwig authorize the release of a copy of the Reasons for Decision and Penalty to McMaster prior to his attendance, that he pay the cost of the above-noted programs, and that he agree to an inspection of his practice after two years of the kind provided for under s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1993-01-22
Hearing Date(s): 23 Oct 1989