skip to content

Luchkiw, Crystal S.

CPSO#: 97606

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
274 Hurst Drive suite 101
Barrie ON  L4N 0Z3
Phone: (705) 726-1191 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Collingwood General &
Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Dept of Family Medicine/Hospitalist
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Canada
Phone: (705) 445-2550
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Royal Victoria Regional
Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: 705-728-9802
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Crystal Luchkiw Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CRYSTAL S. LUCHKIW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUCHKIW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2014 to 29 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2014