skip to content

Luce, John Thomas

CPSO#: 21036

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of 04 May 2022
EXPIRY DATE
04 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 12 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 4-May-2022

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Manitoba, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John T. Luce Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Luce ( CPSO# 21036 )

Business Address:
541 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Phone Number: (905) 685-1381

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 04 May 2022