skip to content

Luce, Anna Louise

CPSO#: 19311

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 10 Jun 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Apr 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996