skip to content

Lucas, William John

CPSO#: 29277

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
17 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 25 Morton Shulman Avenue, Toronto ON M3M 0B1 Tel: (6470 329-1825 email: [email protected]
Instructions: Records pertaining to coroner investigations will be available by contacting the Office of the Regional Supervising Coroner, Central West Region.
Date Received: 16 Jul 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 2021