Gil, Lucas (CPSO#: 86407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winchester District Memorial Hosp
Department of Anaesthesia
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Smiths Falls Site
Perth and Smiths Falls Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Canada
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Perth Site
Perth and Smiths Falls Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Canada
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Rd
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Canada
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Carleton Place & District Memorial
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 613-257-2200
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Gastrointestinal Institute
1910 St Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: 613 686 6656
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lucas Gil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gil ( CPSO# 86407 )

Business Address:
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone Number: (613) 257-2200

Business Address:
1910 St. Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 686-6656

Business Address:
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 744-2420

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 McKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8

Business Address:
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospitals
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9

Business Address:
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospitals
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1

Business Address:
Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUCAS GIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2010