skip to content

Lubitz, Rebecca Jean

CPSO#: 87038

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Nov 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Univ of California, San Francisco, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone: (519) 804-9234 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rebecca Lubitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lubitz ( CPSO# 87038 )

Business Address:
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone Number: (519) 804-9234

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Medical Day Unit
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 783-0024

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REBECCA JEAN LUBITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUBITZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2010