skip to content

Lubell, Richard Frank

CPSO#: 21843

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Apr 1969
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1653 Richmond Street
London ON  N6G2M9
Phone: (519) 850-3800
Fax: (519) 850-5099 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard F. Lubell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lubell ( CPSO# 21843 )

Business Address:
1653 Richmond Street
London ON  N6G 2M9
Phone Number: (519) 850-3800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD FRANK LUBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUBELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 May 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)