skip to content

Lu, Lucy Xi

CPSO#: 95103

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2330 Kennedy Road
Suite 210
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Phone: 416-335-1717
Fax: 416-335-1719 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

5734 Yonge Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Canada
Phone: 416-222-5501
Fax: 416-222-1932
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

300 John St.
Suite 203
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Canada
Phone: 905-764-0188
Fax: 905-764-0189
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

510-330 York Regional Road 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Canada
Phone: (905) 707-5007
Fax: (905) 707-5008
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L. Lu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lu ( CPSO# 95103 )

Business Address:
510-330 York Regional Road 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 9, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On March 11, 2019, North York General Hospital (NYGH) notified the College, pursuant to S.33 (b) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective November 9, 2018, the hospital privileges held by Dr. Lucy Xi Lu at NYGH were restricted.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:28 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:27 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUCY XI LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015

Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: September 27, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective January 29, 2021, Dr. Lucy Lu has completed the required elements of her SCERP dated September 27, 2019.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)