skip to content

Lu, Jonathan Chun Ting

CPSO#: 97642

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Yale University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Cardiology Asso
110 Copper Creek Dr.
#205
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone: (905) 472-9200
Fax: (905) 472-9206 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: 905-472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jonathan Lu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lu ( CPSO# 97642 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Cardiology Association
205 - 110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-9200

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Suite 3
28 Sandiford Drive
Stouffville ON  L4A 3V9
Phone Number: (888) 653-5147

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:07 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JONATHAN CHUN TING LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015