skip to content

Lu, Christopher Mark

CPSO#: 93396

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 200
1A Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4
Phone: 9058738883
Fax: 2898012239 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christopher Mark Lu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lu ( CPSO# 93396 )

Business Address:
200 - 1A Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4
Phone Number: (905) 873-8883

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:31 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MARK LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2010