skip to content

Loveless, Peter Alan

CPSO#: 22928

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may contact: Dr. Todd Greenspoon 632 King St. E. Hamilton, ON L8N 1E2
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013