skip to content

Love Jones, Helen

CPSO#: 26095

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Cole, Helen Love (used until: 11 Jun 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Welsh National School of Medicine, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006