skip to content

Louzada, Martha de Lacerda

CPSO#: 85743

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 May 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 May 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:Souza Marques Technical Educational Foun, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus Site
Dept of Haematology Room E6-213
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 52391
Fax: (519) 685-8294 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Martha Louzada Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Louzada ( CPSO# 85743 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus Site
Department of Haematology Room E6 - 213
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective:11 May 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:11 May 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
PEAP - CF - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2006 to 31 Oct 2007
CF - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Oct 2008
CF - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 31 Oct 2008 to 30 Oct 2009
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active
             1.    Dr. Martha de Lacerda Louzada may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of   Haematology, University of Western Ontario, in which
                        Dr. Louzada holds  an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Louzada no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.