Loureiro, Carla (CPSO#: 100179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 742-0107
Fax: (519) 742-4657
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Conestoga College Health Services
299 Doon Valley Drive
Kitchener ON  N2G 4M4
Canada
Phone: (519) 748 5220
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Martins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Loureiro ( CPSO# 100179)
Dr. E. Martins ( CPSO# 102218)

Business Address:
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 208
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 742-0107

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 May 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLA LOUREIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUREIRO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2016