skip to content

Louis, Lenus Sukirtharajah

CPSO#: 97517

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5117 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9A 1C1
Phone: 416-901-7274
Fax: (647) 559-1248 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1-3600 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1C 4Y8
Canada
Phone: 4162830084
Fax: 6475591248
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lenus S. Louis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Louis ( CPSO# 97517 )

Business Address:
5117 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M9A 1C1

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 May 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Dec 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013 Active
                   Dr. Lenus Sukirtharajah Louis may practise medicine independently limited
                  to   primary   care   medicine,  excluding  obstetrics,  gynaecology  and
                  paediatrics.