skip to content

Louie, Alexander Vincent

CPSO#: 88563

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue, T-Wing
Room T2-163
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6128
Fax: 416-480-6002 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alexander V Louie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Louie ( CPSO# 88563 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4951

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER VINCENT LOUIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2014