skip to content

Lougheed, Taylor Phillips Johnson

CPSO#: 97609

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
Emergency Department
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lougheed and Ellies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: T. Lougheed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lougheed ( CPSO# 97609 )

Business Address:
50 College Dr
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:19 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TAYLOR PHILLIPS JOHNSON LOUGHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUGHEED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014